U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.