U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00271
  • Case Name: Golden Beach, Inc. v. Dollar Tree, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.