U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cintron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Request for Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Requested]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Issued ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.