U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-30316
  • Case Name: Kurt Datz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • July 20, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 18, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
  • July 11, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reduce Time]
  • July 08, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • July 06, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
  • June 24, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 22, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 21, 2016: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.