U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07013
  • Case Name: Drew v. Pinnacle Career Institute et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stay]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 13, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • September 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • August 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • August 16, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.