U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 04-30236
  • Case Name: Racing Services, Inc. and PW Enterprises, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Objection]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Administrative Expenses]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update Claim]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Update Claim]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Correspondence]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Response]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Complaint]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Hearing Held]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Response]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Application (21 day notice)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Application (21 day notice)]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Affidavit]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Affidavit]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Administrative Expenses]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Affidavit]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Affidavit]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Objection to Claim]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Hearing Held]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Objection to Claim]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Brief]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Brief]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Response]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Response]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Raschke, Robert B. [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.