U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30360
  • Case Name: Dennis R Enno and Anita A Enno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.