U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30359
  • Case Name: Dwight Allen Dinkel and Roberta Ellen Dinkel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
  • June 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.