U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30370
  • Case Name: Joseph Dietz and Debra Dietz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Comply]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Convert Case to 13]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Convert Case to 13]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.