U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30372
  • Case Name: Ann Vossekuil
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.