U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30371
  • Case Name: Bradley Keith Brouillet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment of Fee]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Update EOUST Stats]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Intent]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Schedu1es A-J]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.