U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30376
  • Case Name: Alexis Anne Potter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustees Report]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sell]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sell]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Proposed Use, Sale or Lease of Property]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling - Case Upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.