U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30375
  • Case Name: Scott J Volker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Service]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Amendment Cover Sheet]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Amended Schedules]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Financial Management Course]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Document]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.