U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30374
  • Case Name: Lance T Comeau
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.