U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30381
  • Case Name: Matthew Jorstad and Andrea Jorstad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
September, 2017
  • September 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Update EOUST Stats]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Intent]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.