U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30384
  • Case Name: Taharr Safriwe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule J]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule I]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule H]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule G]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule D]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule C]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule A/B]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.