U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30387
  • Case Name: Brett Anderson and Rhonda Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.