U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30390
  • Case Name: Todd Calvin Beymer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Financial Management Course]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
July, 2017
  • July 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.