U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30393
  • Case Name: James H. Ell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
June, 2020
  • June 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
  • June 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • June 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.