U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30402
  • Case Name: James Aaker and RaNae Aaker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Reply of No Objection]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Relief from Stay]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.