U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30420
  • Case Name: John Walter Kuk, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Update EOUST Stats]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Intent]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.