U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30423
  • Case Name: Douglas Edward Arends
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Final Account]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Final Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Correspondence]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Assets]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Reply]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Reply]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Extend Time]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Turnover Property]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
November, 2017
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Examination]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Examination]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon conversion)]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • October 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (Debtor)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 13 to 7 Voluntarily by Debtor]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.