U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30461
  • Case Name: Nicholas William Lees, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Affidavit]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auditor's Report]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Selected for Audit]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
July, 2017
  • July 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.