U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30470
  • Case Name: Matthew Palm
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.