U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30467
  • Case Name: Mike Tolpingrud
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2017
  • November 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2017
  • July 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.