U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-30686
  • Case Name: S. Thomas Frank and Janice Frank
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • May 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pay Ch. 7 Reopening Fee]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compensation]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sealed Document]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Seal]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.