U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-30238
  • Case Name: Adam Fleck and Darlene Fleck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2021
  • October 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Redact]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wagner, Michael L. [Redact (Fee Per Case)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.