U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30477
  • Case Name: Maria Rae Nenow and Peter Douglas Nenow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2017
  • November 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Update EOUST Stats]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Intent]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Schedu1es A-J]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Extend Time]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.