U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30479
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Kerr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
December, 2019
  • December 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update Claim]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.