U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30491
  • Case Name: Daniel Louis Thompson and Jann Elizabeth Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BAP re: Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Abandon]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Abandon by Trustee]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order to Set Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Notice of Fees Due]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Misc Notice]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Abandon]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Comply]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
December, 2017
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reconsider]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Abandon by Trustee]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reconsider]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reconsider]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule J-2]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [UST Statement of Declination]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Affidavit]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • October 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Presumed Abuse]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order on Generic Motion]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Extend Time]
  • August 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Complaint]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Extend Time]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Waive Filing Fee]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.