U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30505
  • Case Name: Russel Schmeling and Janelle Schmeling
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
November, 2017
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Examination]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Examination]
August, 2017
  • August 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.