U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30511
  • Case Name: Russell M. Moen and Sheila M. Moen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.