U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30513
  • Case Name: Jennifer Muriel Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
  • January 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • November 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Cure Order]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
May, 2019
  • May 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
November, 2018
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2017
  • October 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Complaint]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.