U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30516
  • Case Name: Dennis L. Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Application for Compensation (Without Notice)]
February, 2018
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Motion]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Motion (Call Court before using)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.