U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30515
  • Case Name: Cynthia L. Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2017
  • November 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appointment of Successor Trustee]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee Resignation (Successor Trustee Appointed)]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bergian, Cheryl [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.