U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30518
  • Case Name: Kimberley Ann Schauer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.