U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30524
  • Case Name: Christofer Theurer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTERS Other than 7]
  • September 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certification of Domestic Support Obligations]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Notice Regarding Domestic Support Obligation]
  • August 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Plan Payments Complete]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
September, 2018
  • September 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modified Plan (after confirmation)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Modify Plan (After Confirmation)]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.