U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07016
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Marr et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • February 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Contempt]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Motion (Call Court before using)]
  • January 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order on Generic Motion]
  • December 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • December 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • November 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • November 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 10, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • October 02, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • September 20, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • September 18, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Party]
  • September 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • September 08, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • September 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Misc Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 27, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 24, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.