U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07017
  • Case Name: Kaler v. Vasvick et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • October 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • August 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transmittal of Record for Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Post-Trial Documents]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Post-Trial Documents]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
  • May 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Consolidate]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • February 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Consolidate/Deconsolidate]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Consolidate/Deconsolidate]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • December 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Post-Trial Documents]
  • May 30, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • May 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • April 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • April 03, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Oral Argument]
  • March 22, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • March 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • October 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 17, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 17, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • September 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 29, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 28, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.