U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30531
  • Case Name: James R Porter and Anita C Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 13]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.