U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30536
  • Case Name: Wayne A. Gapp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
December, 2020
  • December 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Audio CD Request]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule A/B]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Filing 3004 Claim]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update Claim]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Mortgage Proof of Claim Attachment]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule H]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.