U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30535
  • Case Name: Grand Dakota Partners, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Chapter 11]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order to Set Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reconsider]
  • March 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • February 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Claim]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 11 to 7]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Correspondence]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit List]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • June 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Administrative Expenses]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit List]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amend]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply of No Objection]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amend]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney ]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Substitute Attorney]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 11 Plan]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Computation and Chapter 11 Ballots]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 11 to 7]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approving Disclosure Statement]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Addendum to Plan]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Claim]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Denying Approval Of Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Disclosure Statement]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure Statement]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Correspondence]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
December, 2017
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Exclusivity Period]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Misc Notice]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Exclusivity Period]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Convert Case 11 to 7]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Contempt]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Contempt]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Quash]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Access to Documents]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sealed Document]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Trustee's Initial Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Quash]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Access to Documents]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Quash]
  • September 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Access to Documents]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transfer Case (bk)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.