U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30540
  • Case Name: Firehouse Ribs, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Chapter 11]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Comply]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Federal Income Tax Return]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Cash Flow Statement]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Statement of Operations]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Balance Sheet]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint a Creditor's Committee]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Comply]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule H]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule G]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule E/F]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule D]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedule A/B]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Stay]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduce Time]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.