U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-31129
  • Case Name: Ruth Ann Renner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Held]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Avoid Lien]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • September 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.