U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-07018
  • Case Name: PW Enterprises, Inc. v. Bala
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 15, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 04, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • December 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • December 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Objection]
  • November 07, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • October 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 31, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • October 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 06, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 05, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.