U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30557
  • Case Name: Craig A. Schauer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2017
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.