U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30558
  • Case Name: Ronald G. McMartin, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • June 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit List]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Witness List]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Witness List]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit List]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Administrative Expenses]
  • January 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • January 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Abandonment]
  • January 11, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Final Report]
  • January 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Update Claim]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • October 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Response]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • October 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • October 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Response]
  • October 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection to Claim]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • June 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amended Order]
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amend]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amend]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell]
  • April 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Joinder]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • April 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Misc Notice]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Report of Sale]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Misc Notice]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell]
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Misc Notice]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Witness List]
  • February 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit List]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • February 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Reply]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Correspondence]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amended Order]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amend]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Reduce Time]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amend]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Order (Generic)]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit List]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Witness List]
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Reply]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Application (21 day notice)]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amended Schedules]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Refund of Filing Fee]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Refund of Filing Fee]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Pay AP Filing Fee]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Exhibit]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Settlement Agreement]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Amended Order]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Compensation]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Limit Notice]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Transcript]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Document]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Hearing Held]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Objection]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Examination]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Complaint]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Assets]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Application (14 day notice)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Employ]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Velde, David G. [Trustee Resignation and Report of Administration]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
September, 2017
  • September 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Examination]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Exhibit]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statement of Intent]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Employ]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Examination]
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Document]
  • September 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appointment Rejection (To be used within 7 days of filing)]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.