U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30559
  • Case Name: Alonna Knorr Norberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Settlement Agreement]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Exhibit]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedule C]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Exhibit]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Amended Schedules]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [xAmended Document (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [xAmended Document (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.