U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30564
  • Case Name: Travis Morkve and Jessica Morkve
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Correspondence]
  • December 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amendment Cover Sheet]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • September 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.