U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30575
  • Case Name: Linnea E Cheetham
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2018
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Comply]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee-Chapter 7]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Waive Filing Fee]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.